Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/05/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/26/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/26/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/26/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/26/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 01/26/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/26/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 01/26/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/26/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/26/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 01/26/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/26/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/26/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 01/26/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/26/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 01/26/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 01/26/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 01/26/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/26/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 01/26/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 01/26/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/26/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 01/26/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/26/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/26/1993
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/26/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 01/26/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/03/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 02/03/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/03/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 02/03/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/03/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/03/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/03/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 02/03/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/03/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/03/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/17/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/17/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 02/24/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/24/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/24/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/24/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/24/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 02/24/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/24/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/09/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/09/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/09/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 03/09/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/09/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/09/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/09/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/30/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/30/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/30/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/30/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/30/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/26/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 04/26/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 04/26/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/26/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/26/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/26/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/25/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 05/25/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/25/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/25/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/11/1994