There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To contain the rate of growth in health care costs and enhance the quality of health care by improving and making more efficient the provision of medical and health insurance information, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/25/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
07/01/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/01/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/15/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
06/11/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/02/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/25/1993Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/1993Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/1993Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/1993Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/25/1993
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5]* 05/25/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 05/25/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/29/1993

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor05/25/1993 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations06/15/1993 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce05/25/1993 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Competitiveness07/01/1993 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment07/01/1993 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs05/25/1993 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care06/11/1993 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/25/1993 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health06/02/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2261.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2261. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/25/1993)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: Standardization of Claims Processing

Title II: Electronic Medical Data Standards

Title III: Development and Distribution of Comparative

Value Information

Title IV: Additional Standards and Requirements; Research

and Demonstrations

Title I: Standardization of Claims Processing - Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services to adopt standards relating to each of the following: (1) data elements for use in paper and electronic claims processing under health benefit plans, as well as for use in utilization review and management of care; (2) uniform claims forms; and (3) uniform electronic transmission of the data elements.

Title II: Electronic Medical Data Standards - Requires the Secretary to promulgate standards for hospitals concerning electronic medical data, including: (1) a definition of a standard set of data elements for use by utilization and quality control peer review organizations; (2) a definition of the set of comprehensive data elements; (3) standards for an electronic patient care information system; (4) standards concerning the transmission of electronic medical data; and (5) standards relating to confidentiality of patient-specific information.

Establishes an advisory commission to advise the Secretary concerning the standards. Authorizes appropriations.

Title III: Development and Distribution of Comparative Value Information - Provides for the development and implementation in each State of a comparative health care value information program that covers the prices of health care services and health insurance plans. Authorizes appropriations.

Title IV: Additional Standards and Requirements; Research and Demonstrations - Provides for: (1) magnetized identification cards under both Medicare and Medicaid; and (2) a Medicare and Medicaid data bank that provides information on health plan payors under Medicare and Medicaid. Authorizes appropriations.

Preempts State quill pen laws.

Requires the use of standard identification numbers by health benefit plans.

Provides for the coordination of benefits when two or more health benefit plans are liable, if the Secretary determines there is a need for such coordination.