Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/10/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/17/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/17/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/17/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/17/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/17/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/28/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/14/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 10/14/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/14/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/26/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew