Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 05/27/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/27/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 06/14/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/14/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/16/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/16/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/18/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/18/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/28/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/28/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/01/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/28/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/28/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/28/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 08/05/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/13/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/21/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 10/26/1993