Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/24/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/24/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/24/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/24/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/24/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/24/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 07/01/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/01/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 07/01/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/01/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 07/01/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/14/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 07/14/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/14/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/14/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/14/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/14/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/14/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 07/14/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/14/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/14/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/20/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 07/20/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 07/20/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 07/20/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/20/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 08/04/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 08/04/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 08/04/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 08/04/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 08/04/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/04/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 08/06/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 08/06/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 08/06/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 08/06/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 08/06/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/06/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 08/06/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 08/06/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 08/06/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 08/06/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/28/1993
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 09/28/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 10/07/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 10/07/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 10/07/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/07/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/07/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/14/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 10/14/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/14/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/14/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/10/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/10/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/10/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/22/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/22/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 11/22/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 11/22/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/22/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/02/1994