Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98]* 05/27/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/15/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/15/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 06/15/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 06/15/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/15/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/15/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/15/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/15/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 07/29/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/29/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/29/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/29/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/29/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/29/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/29/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 07/29/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/29/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/29/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/29/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/29/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/29/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 07/29/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/29/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 07/29/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/29/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/29/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/29/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/29/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 07/29/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/29/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 07/29/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/29/1993
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 07/29/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/08/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/08/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 09/08/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/08/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/08/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/08/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/08/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 09/08/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 09/23/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/23/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/23/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/23/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/23/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/23/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/23/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 09/23/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/23/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/20/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/20/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/20/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 10/20/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/20/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 10/20/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/20/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 10/20/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 10/20/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 10/20/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/20/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/20/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/20/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 11/02/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 11/02/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 11/02/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 11/02/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 11/02/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/02/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 11/02/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/02/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 01/25/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 01/25/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/25/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/25/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/22/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/11/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/11/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/11/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 03/11/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/11/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/11/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 03/11/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/12/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 05/20/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 05/20/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 05/20/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/20/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/20/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 06/13/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 06/13/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/13/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/21/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/21/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/21/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/21/1994
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 06/21/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/21/1994