There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

American Jobs Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide assistance to employees who are subject to a plant closing or mass layoff because their work is transferred to a foreign country that has low wages or unhealthy working conditions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/08/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
11/14/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
06/10/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1465)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/1993Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/06/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/06/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/06/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/06/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/06/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/06/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/06/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 08/06/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 08/06/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 08/06/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 08/06/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/06/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/06/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 08/06/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 08/06/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 08/06/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/06/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/06/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 08/06/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 08/06/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 08/06/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 08/06/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 08/06/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/06/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 08/06/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 08/06/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/06/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 08/06/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/06/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/06/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 08/06/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 08/06/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/06/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 08/06/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 08/06/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 08/06/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/06/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 08/06/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 08/06/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/06/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 10/14/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 10/14/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/14/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/14/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/24/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/24/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/24/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/24/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/24/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/24/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/24/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 02/24/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/24/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 08/04/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor06/08/1993 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations11/14/1994 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2345.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2345. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/1993)

American Jobs Protection Act - Requires employers to provide specified notice and employee benefits (including severance pay, continuation of health care benefits, reimbursement for retraining, training incentive payments, and accelerated eligibility for early retirement) to employees who are subject to a plant closing or mass layoff because their work is transferred to (or similar products are imported from) another country which has specified levels of lower wages or less effective employment standards for overtime compensation, child labor, and employee safety.

Prohibits employers who do not provide such notice and benefits from entering into a contract with the United States for provision of products or services involved in the work transfer or substantially similar to such products or services.

Provides for enforcement of this Act by: (1) investigative and administrative actions and actions for injunctions by the Secretary of Labor; and (2) civil actions by employees, local governments, States, and the Secretary.

Requires employers to post notice concerning this Act and the filing of a charge. Authorizes civil fines for violations.