Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 06/10/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/10/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/01/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/01/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/01/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/01/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/01/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 11/23/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/03/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/03/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/03/1994