Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/14/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 07/21/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/13/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/13/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/13/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/13/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/13/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/13/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/13/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/13/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/27/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/19/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 11/23/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 02/03/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/08/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/08/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/03/1994