Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 01/05/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 01/05/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/20/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/20/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 01/20/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/20/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 01/20/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/20/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 01/20/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 01/20/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/26/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 01/26/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 01/26/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 01/26/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/26/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/26/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 01/26/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/26/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/26/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/27/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 01/27/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/27/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/02/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/02/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/04/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/04/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/04/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/04/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 02/24/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 02/24/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/08/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/16/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/16/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/23/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/22/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/25/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 08/10/1994
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/27/1994