There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide priority health care to veterans of the Persian Gulf War who were exposed to environmental hazards.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/15/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/21/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/15/1993Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/15/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/15/1993
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/17/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/22/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/28/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/28/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/28/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/28/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/28/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/28/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/28/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/28/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/28/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/28/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/30/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/30/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/13/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 07/13/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/13/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/20/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 07/20/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/20/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/29/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/29/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/29/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/29/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/29/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/29/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 09/08/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/26/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/19/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/15/1993 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care06/21/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2414.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2414. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/15/1993)

Amends Federal veterans' benefits provisions to: (1) require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide hospital care, and authorize such Secretary to provide nursing home care, to veterans exposed to environmental hazards during their military service; (2) make eligible for hospital and nursing home care for any disability of a Persian Gulf War veteran who was exposed to environmental hazards; (3) extend the authority for all such care through FY 2003; and (4) provide priority outpatient care for any disability of a Persian Gulf War veteran exposed during such service to environmental hazards.