Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/15/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/22/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/22/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/22/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/22/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 06/22/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/22/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/22/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/22/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/22/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/28/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/28/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/28/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/28/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/28/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/28/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/28/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/13/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/13/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/13/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/13/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/19/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/19/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/19/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/19/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/19/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 07/21/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/21/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 07/21/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/21/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/21/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/28/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/28/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 08/03/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 08/03/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 08/03/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/06/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/13/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/14/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/14/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 09/14/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/14/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/21/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/06/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/15/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 11/03/1993