There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Civil Asset Forfeiture Reform Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reform certain statutes regarding civil asset forfeiture.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/15/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
06/24/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime and Criminal Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/21/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/15/1993Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/1993Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/22/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/22/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/22/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/22/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/28/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/28/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/28/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 06/28/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/28/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 06/30/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/30/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/30/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/30/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/30/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 06/30/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/30/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/30/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/14/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/14/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/14/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/14/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/14/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/20/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/20/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/20/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 08/02/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 08/02/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 08/06/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/09/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/09/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/09/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/14/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/14/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/14/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/21/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/21/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/05/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/20/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 10/20/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/20/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/20/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 11/17/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 11/17/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/09/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/24/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/11/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/12/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/12/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/12/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/12/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/12/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/20/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 11/29/1994

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/15/1993 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime and Criminal Justice06/24/1993 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/15/1993 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade06/21/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2417.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2417. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/15/1993)

Civil Asset Forfeiture Reform Act - Amends the Federal judicial code to exclude from the customs and tax exemption under tort claims procedures any claim based on the negligent destruction, injury, or loss of goods or merchandise (including real property) while in the possession of any customs or other law enforcement officer.

Extends the period for filing claims in certain in rem proceedings.

Amends the Tariff Act of 1930 to provide that: (1) in all suits or actions brought for the forfeiture of any vessel, vehicle, aircraft, merchandise, or baggage seized under the provisions of any law relating to the collection of duties on imports or tonnage, with exceptions, and for the recovery of the value of any forfeited property because of violation of any such law, the burden of proof is on the Government to establish by clear and convincing evidence that the property was subject to forfeiture; (2) any person claiming such property may at any time within 60 days from the date of the first publication of the notice of seizure file a claim with the appropriate customs officer, who shall transmit such claim to the U.S. attorney for the district in which seizure was made; and (3) if the person filing such claim (or a claim regarding seized property under any other provision of law that incorporates by reference the seizure, forfeiture, and condemnation procedures of the customs laws) is financially unable to obtain representation, the court may appoint counsel, subject to specified requirements.

Specifies that a claimant is entitled to immediate release of seized property if continued possession by the Government would cause the claimant substantial hardship. Sets forth procedures regarding the request for release, return of property, and time for decision by the court on a complaint for such return.

Makes sums in the Department of Justice Assets Forfeiture Fund available for the payment of court-awarded compensation for representation of claimants under the Tariff Act, with respect to seizure claims by individuals financially unable to obtain representation of counsel.