There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Persian Gulf War Environmental Hazards Study Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the establishment of a specialized environmental medical unit to investigate the possible health effects of environmental and chemical exposures of United States military personnel in the Persian Gulf War and for related civilian purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/17/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
08/02/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/21/1993Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
06/21/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/17/1993Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/17/1993Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/17/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/17/1993
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 06/17/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/17/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/17/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 06/29/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/06/1993

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/17/1993 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Research and Technology06/21/1993 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce06/17/1993 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment08/02/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2451.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2451. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/17/1993)

Persian Gulf War Environmental Hazards Study Act - Directs the Secretary of Defense to make a grant to a medical research institution selected through established acquisition procedures for constructing and equipping a specialized environmental medical facility to study the possible health effects of exposure to volatile chemicals and the susceptibility of humans to such exposure under environmentally controlled conditions. Requires such grant funds to be obtained from FY 1994 Department of Defense research, development, test, and evaluation funds. Provides research institution selection criteria. Requires such research to focus on persons who may have been exposed to environmental hazards or chemical substances while serving on active duty on Southwest Asia during the Persian Gulf War.

Requires the Secretary to report annually to the Congress on the research activities.