Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 06/18/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/18/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 06/18/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 06/18/1993
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5]* 06/18/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 06/18/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/18/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/18/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 06/18/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/18/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/18/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 07/29/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/29/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/29/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 07/29/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/29/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/02/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/09/1993
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/09/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/15/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 11/15/1993

Show cosponsors who withdrew