There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Lead-Based Paint Hazard Abatement Trust Fund Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Residential Lead-Based Paint Hazard Reduction Act of 1992 to establish an entitlement of States and certain political subdivisions of States to receive grants from the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development for the abatement of health hazards associated with lead-based paint, and to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to impose an excise tax and establish a trust fund to satisfy the Federal obligations arising from such entitlement.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/22/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
07/01/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
06/22/1993Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/22/1993Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/22/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1586)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/22/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/22/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/22/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/22/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/22/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/22/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 06/22/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/13/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/13/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/13/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/13/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/13/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/13/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/13/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 09/13/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/13/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 09/13/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/13/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/13/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/06/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 10/06/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/06/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/06/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/06/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/08/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/08/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/08/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/08/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/08/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/05/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/05/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/05/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/20/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/20/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/20/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/20/1994

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs06/22/1993 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development07/01/1993 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/22/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2479.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2479. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/22/1993)

Lead-Based Paint Hazard Abatement Trust Fund Act of 1993 - Amends the Housing and Community Development Act of 1992 to establish a program of formula allotments to eligible public entities for lead-based paint hazard reduction.

Sets forth matching requirements and authorized uses of grants. Prohibits States from providing grants to public entities or other units of general local government unless such entities or units have local lead-based paint laws in effect.

Permits the expenditure of grant amounts only in accordance with an approved plan that sets priorities for lead risk assessment and abatement in rental housing and in owner-occupied housing occupied by children and pregnant women. Requires the certification of personnel conducting assessment and abatement activities. Bars the use of more than 20 percent of a grant for emergency measures. Limits assistance to small nonprofit organizations and businesses for performing such activities to one percent of the grant amount.

Provides for the continued use of eligible residential units at which lead abatement activities are carried out as affordable housing. Permits grant amounts to be expended for abatement activities for an eligible unit only if the eligible public entity has entered into an agreement with the unit owner that: (1) provides for the abatement activities to be carried out; (2) establishes a lien (held by the public entity) on the unit to ensure compliance with affordable housing requirements; and (3) provides penalties for the breach of the agreement.

Sets forth elements of plans required to be submitted by public entities as a condition of receiving grants.

Establishes formulas for the determination of allotments.

Authorizes appropriations from the Lead Abatement Trust Fund to carry out this Act.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to impose a tax of 45 cents per pound on: (1) lead removed from any U.S. smelter; and (2) lead and lead in any taxable lead product entered into the United States for consumption, use, or warehousing. Provides a credit or refund for tax paid on lead or lead products that were exported.

Establishes the Lead Abatement Trust Fund.