Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/22/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/22/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/22/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/22/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/22/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 06/22/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/13/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/13/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/13/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/13/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/13/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/13/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/13/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 09/13/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/13/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 09/13/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/13/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/13/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/06/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 10/06/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/06/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/06/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/06/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/08/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/08/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/08/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/08/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/08/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/05/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/05/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/05/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/20/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/20/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/20/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 09/20/1994