Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/26/1993
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 01/26/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 01/26/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 01/26/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 01/26/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 01/26/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 01/26/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 01/26/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 01/26/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/26/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/26/1993
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 01/26/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 01/26/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 01/26/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/26/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 01/26/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 01/26/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/26/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/26/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/26/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/26/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/26/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/26/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/26/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/26/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 01/26/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 01/26/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 01/26/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 01/26/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 01/26/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 01/26/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/26/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 01/26/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/26/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/26/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/26/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 01/26/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/26/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 01/26/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 01/26/1993
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 01/26/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 01/26/1993
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/26/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 01/26/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/02/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/02/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/02/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/02/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/02/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/02/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/02/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/02/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/02/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/02/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/02/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 02/04/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/04/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/04/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/04/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 02/04/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 02/04/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/04/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/24/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 02/24/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/24/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 02/24/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/24/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/24/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/24/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 02/24/1993
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 02/24/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/24/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/24/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/24/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 03/24/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 03/24/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/24/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/24/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/24/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/24/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/24/1993
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 03/24/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/24/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/24/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/24/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/24/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/12/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/12/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/12/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/12/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/12/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/12/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/12/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/24/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/24/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 11/10/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/23/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 03/02/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 07/29/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew