Text: H.R.25 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/23/1993)

 
[Congressional Bills 103th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 25 Introduced in House (IH)]

103d CONGRESS
  1st Session
                                 H. R. 25

              To protect the reproductive rights of women.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                            January 5, 1993

Mr. Edwards of California (for himself, Mr. Fazio, Mrs. Kennelly, Mrs. 
Morella, Ms. Molinari, Mr. Sabo, Miss Collins of Michigan, Ms. Harman, 
 Mr. Klein, Mr. Mineta, Mrs. Mink, Mr. Schumer, Mr. Shays, Ms. Snowe, 
 and Mr. Nadler) introduced the following bill; which was referred to 
                     the Committee on the Judiciary

                            February 5, 1993

  Additional sponsors: Mr. Abercrombie, Mr. Ackerman, Mr. Andrews of 
Texas, Mr. Andrews of New Jersey, Mr. Andrews of Maine, Mr. Bacchus of 
  Florida, Mr. Beilenson, Mr. Boehlert, Mrs. Byrne, Mr. DeFazio, Mr. 
 Derrick, Mr. Deutsch, Mr. Dooley, Ms. Eshoo, Mr. Filner, Mr. Ford of 
   Tennessee, Mr. Ford of Michigan, Mr. Frank of Massachusetts, Mr. 
Gibbons, Mr. Hinchey, Mr. Kopetski, Mr. Lehman, Mr. Markey, Mr. Matsui, 
  Mr. McDermott, Mr. Meehan, Mr. Miller of California, Mr. Moran, Mr. 
 Olver, Mr. Owens, Ms. Pelosi, Mr. Reynolds, Mr. Sanders, Ms. Schenk, 
Mr. Studds, Mr. Wynn, Mr. Swift, Mr. Washington, Mr. Wheat, Mr. Yates, 
 Mr. Frost, Mr. Becerra, Mr. Wilson, Mr. Pallone, Mr. Coppersmith, Mr. 
 Gene Green of Texas, Mr. Machtley, Mr. Conyers, Mr. Clay, Mrs. Meek, 
 Mr. Engel, Mr. Fingerhut, Mrs. Johnson of Connecticut, Mr. Carr, Mr. 
 Pastor, Mr. Brown of California, Mr. Watt, Mr. Dicks, Mr. Hughes, Mr. 
     Rush, Mr. Blackwell, Mr. Coleman, Mr. Dellums, Mr. Evans, Mr. 
    Greenwood, Mr. Hamburg, Mr. Johnston of Florida, Mr. Levin, Mr. 
   Martinez, Ms. Norton, Mr. Payne of New Jersey, Mr. Price of North 
 Carolina, Ms. Roybal-Allard, Mr. Scott, Ms. Shepherd, Mr. Skaggs, Mr. 
 Smith of Oregon, Mr. Stark, Ms. Velazquez, Mr. Gallo, Mr. Dixon, Mr. 
     Bryant, Mr. Kreidler, Mrs. Collins of Illinois, Mr. Franks of 
                      Connecticut, and Mr. Waxman

                             March 23, 1993

Additional sponsors: Mr. Rangel, Mrs. Unsoeld, Mr. Peterson of Florida, 
   Ms. DeLauro, Mr. Barrett of Wisconsin, Mr. Williams, Mr. Lewis of 
Georgia, Mr. Hoyer, Mr. Gejdenson, Ms. English of Arizona, Mr. Pickle, 
Mr. Hochbrueckner, Mr. Wyden, Mr. Vento, and Ms. Eddie Bernice Johnson 
                                of Texas
 Deleted sponsor: Mr. Smith of Oregon (added February 2, 1993; deleted 
                           February 16, 1993)

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
              To protect the reproductive rights of women.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Freedom of Choice Act of 1993''.

SEC. 2. RIGHT TO CHOOSE.

    (a) In General.--Except as provided in subsection (b), a State may 
not restrict the right of a woman to choose to terminate a pregnancy--
            (1) before fetal viability; or
            (2) at any time, if such termination is necessary to 
        protect the life or health of the woman.
    (b) Medically Necessary Requirements.--A State may impose 
requirements medically necessary to protect the life or health of women 
referred to in subsection (a).
    (c) Rules of Construction.--Nothing in this Act shall be construed 
to prevent a State--
            (1) from requiring a minor to involve a parent, guardian, 
        or other responsible adult before terminating a pregnancy; or
            (2) from protecting unwilling individuals from having to 
        participate in the performance of abortions to which they are 
        conscientiously opposed.

SEC. 3. DEFINITION OF ``STATE''.

    As used in this Act, the term ``State'' includes the District of 
Columbia, the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, and each other territory or 
possession of the United States.

                                 <all>