There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

World Summit for Children Implementation Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To assist in implementing the Plan of Action adopted by the World Summit for Children.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/23/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
07/15/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
07/15/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary and Vocational Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
07/01/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on International Development, Finance, Trade and Monetary Policy.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
06/23/1993Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/23/1993Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/23/1993Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/23/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1591)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/23/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 06/23/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/23/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/23/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/22/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/22/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/22/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 07/22/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/22/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/22/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 07/22/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/22/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/22/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 07/22/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/22/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/22/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/22/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/22/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/22/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 08/05/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 08/05/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 08/05/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/05/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/05/1993
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 09/08/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/08/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/08/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/08/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 11/02/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/02/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 11/02/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/02/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/02/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/07/1994
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/22/1993 10/19/1993 --

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs06/23/1993 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on International Development, Finance, Trade and Monetary Policy07/01/1993 Referred to
House Education and Labor06/23/1993 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary, and Vocational Education07/15/1993 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Human Resources07/15/1993 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs06/23/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2501.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2501. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/23/1993)

World Summit for Children Implementation Act of 1993 - Expresses the sense of the Congress that specified amounts should be appropriated for FY 1994 and 1995 to achieve full participation in the special supplemental food program for women, infants, and children under the Child Nutrition Act (WIC program) and the Head Start program.

Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to authorize appropriations for FY 1994 and 1995 for contributions to the United Nation's Children's Fund and for the Child Survival Fund.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that authority should be granted to the President to exercise specified debt forgiveness for least developed countries that are pursuing economic policy reforms to promote long-term development.

Earmarks development assistance funds for FY 1994 and 1995 for the Vitamin A Deficiency Program. Authorizes additional appropriations for FY 1994 and 1995 for: (1) iodine and iron fortification programs; and (2) prevention, care, and control programs related to human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) and acquired immune deficiency syndrome (AIDS) in developing countries.

Earmarks development and economic assistance funds for FY 1994 and 1995 for programs in support of basic education.

Authorizes additional appropriations for FY 1994 and 1995 for population assistance activities.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that specified amounts should be appropriated for FY 1994 and 1995 for migration and refugee assistance.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to instruct the U.S. Executive Director of the World Bank to: (1) ensure that poverty reduction and support of basic human needs become a higher priority within the Bank; (2) ensure that the majority of water and sanitation projects fall within targeted interventions against poverty; and (3) increase the proportion of total Bank lending which supports primary health care and basic education, with a minimum of five percent of total lending devoted to each area.

Requires the President to call upon other governments to provide their share of resources required to achieve the World Summit for Children goals by the year 2000.