Committees: H.R.2519 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations01/25/1993 Referred to
06/24/1993 Markup by
06/24/1993 Reported original measure H.Rept 103-157
House Appropriations Subcommittee on Commerce, Justice, State, and Judiciary02/17/1993 Referred to
05/13/1993 Hearings by
06/16/1993 Markup by
Senate Appropriations07/21/1993 Referred to
07/22/1993 Markup by
07/22/1993 Reported by S.Rept 103-105
Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Commerce, Justice, State, and the Judiciary07/21/1993 Markup by
07/21/1993 Reported by