Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/28/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/28/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/28/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/28/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/28/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 06/28/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/28/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 06/28/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 06/28/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/28/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/01/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 07/01/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/01/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 07/01/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/14/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/14/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/14/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 07/14/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 07/20/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/27/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/27/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/27/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/27/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/27/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/27/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/27/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/28/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/29/1993