There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Shipbuilding and Conversion Act of 1993

Short Titles as Introduced

National Shipbuilding and Conversion Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the economy of the United States and promote the national security interests of the United States by establishing a National Shipbuilding Initiative to provide support for the United States shipbuilding industry in order to assist that industry in regaining a significant share of the world commercial shipbuilding market, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/09/1994Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 103-420, Part I.
06/29/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
02/09/1994Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 103-420, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
06/30/1993Subcommittee On Merchant Marine Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
06/30/1993Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
06/30/1993Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
06/30/1993Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/30/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/30/1993Referred to the Subcommittee On Merchant Marine.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
06/29/1993Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/1993Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/29/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/13/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 07/13/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 07/13/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/02/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/02/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/07/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/13/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/13/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/13/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 10/13/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/02/1993

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/29/1993 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Research and Technology06/30/1993 Referred to
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries06/29/1993 Referred to
06/30/1993 Markup by
02/09/1994 Reported by H.Rept 103-420 Part 1
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Merchant Marine06/30/1993 Referred to
06/30/1993 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.2547.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2547. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (02/09/1994)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: National Shipbuilding Initiative

Title II: Guarantees of Obligations for Vessel Construction

and United States Shipyard Modernization

Title III: Series Construction Assistance

Title IV: Double Hull Requirement for Tankers Chartered by

Department of Defense

National Shipbuilding and Conversion Act of 1993 - Title I: National Shipbuilding Initiative - Establishes a National Shipbuilding Initiative program to consist of: (1) a financial incentives program to provide loan guarantees to initiate commercial ship construction, encourage shipyard modernization, and support increased productivity; (2) a technology development program; and (3) enhanced support for specified Department of the Navy shipbuilding programs.

Makes private U.S. shipyards eligible for program financial assistance or participation.

Title II: Guarantees of Obligations for Vessel Construction and United States Shipyard Modernization - Amends the Merchant Marine Act, 1936 to authorize guarantees of obligations for eligible export vessels (defined as vessels constructed, reconstructed, or reconditioned in the United States which will be placed under the laws of another country). Authorizes such guarantees only if the eligible export vessel: (1) will aid in the transition of U.S. shipyards to commercial activities or preserve shipbuilding assets essential in war or a national emergency; and (2) is not transferred to any country hostile to U.S. interests.

Authorizes loan guarantees for advanced shipbuilding technology and modern shipbuilding technology of a general U.S. shipyard facility.

Authorizes appropriations.

Title III: Series Construction Assistance - Authorizes the Secretary of Defense to pay assistance to a U.S. shipyard owner for the construction of any commercial vessel that is one of a series of vessels for which payment of assistance is approved under this title. Establishes conditions for assistance for series construction, including size and marketability of vessels, shipyard construction capability, applicant ability, and requirements for contracts and purchasers.

Title IV: Double Hull Requirement for Tankers Chartered by Department of Defense - Prohibits the Secretary of Defense, after December 31, 1994, from entering into, renewing, or extending a contract for the charter of a tanker unless the tanker: (1) is built in a U.S. shipyard under a contract entered into after October 1, 1993; (2) is equipped with a double hull that satisfies specified tank vessel construction requirements; and (3) is chartered under the contract for at least ten years.

Establishes further limitations on the entering into, renewal, or extension of contracts for charters of tankers that expire after December 31, 1994.