There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Firefighters and Police Retirement Security Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Age Discrimination in Employment Amendments of 1986 to prevent the repeal of the exemption for certain bona fide hiring and retirement plans applicable to State and local firefighters and law enforcement officers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/29/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
11/08/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8882-8883)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/15/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Education and Civil Rights.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
06/29/1993Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1659)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (109)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/29/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 06/29/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/29/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/27/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/27/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/27/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/27/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/27/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/27/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 07/27/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/27/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/12/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 10/12/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/12/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/12/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/12/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 10/12/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/12/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/12/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/12/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/12/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/12/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/23/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/17/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/17/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor06/29/1993 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Select Education and Civil Rights07/15/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2554.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2554. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/29/1993)

Firefighters and Police Retirement Security Act of 1993 - Amends the Age Discrimination in Employment Amendments of 1986 to repeal a provision which would have terminated an exemption for certain bona fide hiring and retirement plans applicable to State and local fire fighters and law enforcement officers. (This Act thereby preserves such exemption beyond 1993.)