Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 06/29/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 06/29/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/29/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 06/29/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/27/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/27/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/27/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/27/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/27/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/27/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 07/27/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/27/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/12/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 10/12/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/12/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/12/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/12/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 10/12/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/12/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/12/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/12/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/12/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/12/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/23/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/17/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/17/1994