Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 07/01/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/01/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/01/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19]* 07/01/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 07/01/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/01/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/01/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/01/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 07/01/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 07/01/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/01/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/01/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/01/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 07/01/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 07/19/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/19/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/19/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/19/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 07/19/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 07/19/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/19/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/19/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/19/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/19/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/08/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/13/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/21/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 09/28/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/08/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/15/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 11/15/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/18/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/18/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/18/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/25/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/25/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/25/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 01/25/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/07/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 02/07/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/07/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 02/24/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/24/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/24/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 02/24/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/24/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 02/24/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/24/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/24/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/24/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 03/15/1994