There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reproductive Health Equity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend various provisions of law to ensure that services related to abortion are made available to the same extent as are all other pregnancy-related services under federally funded programs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/05/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date
04/21/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Fiscal Affairs and Health.
Action By: Committee on District of Columbia
02/16/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/10/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/28/1993Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
01/28/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Forces and Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
01/28/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
01/26/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Native American Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/05/1993Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/1993Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/1993Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/1993Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/1993Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/1993Referred to the House Committee on District of Columbia.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/1993Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E49)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/05/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (92)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/05/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/05/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/26/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 01/26/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 01/26/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/26/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/26/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 01/26/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/26/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/26/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/26/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/26/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/02/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 02/02/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/02/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/02/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/17/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/17/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 02/17/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/17/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/17/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/17/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 02/17/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 02/17/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/09/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/09/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/09/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/09/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/09/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/21/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/13/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/13/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 05/26/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 05/26/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/26/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/08/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/30/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/30/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 07/30/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/30/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 08/03/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/03/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 08/03/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 08/03/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/28/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/28/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 09/28/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/20/1993

Committees (7)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services01/05/1993 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Forces and Personnel01/28/1993 Referred to
House District of Columbia01/05/1993 Referred to
House District of Columbia Subcommittee on Fiscal Affairs and Health04/21/1993 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs01/05/1993 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/05/1993 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment02/16/1993 Referred to
House Natural Resources01/05/1993 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs01/26/1993 Referred to
House Judiciary01/05/1993 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights02/10/1993 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service01/05/1993 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits01/28/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.26.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.26. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/05/1993)

Reproductive Health Equity Act - Amends title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act, the Indian Health Care Improvement Act, the Peace Corps Act, the District of Columbia Self-Government and Governmental Reorganization Act, and other Federal laws covering armed forces personnel and dependents, certain veterans, Federal employees' health benefits, and Federal penal and correctional institutions to provide that services related to abortion be made available to the same extent as are other pregnancy-related services under federally-funded programs.

Repeals provisions of the Indian Health Care Improvement Act requiring submission of a resource allocation plan to the Congress by December 17, 1981.