Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/05/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/05/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/26/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 01/26/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 01/26/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/26/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/26/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 01/26/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/26/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/26/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 01/26/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/26/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/02/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 02/02/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/02/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/02/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/17/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/17/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 02/17/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/17/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/17/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/17/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 02/17/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 02/17/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/09/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/09/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/09/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/09/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/09/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/21/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/13/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/13/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 05/26/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 05/26/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/26/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/08/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/30/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/30/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 07/30/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/30/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 08/03/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/03/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 08/03/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 08/03/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/28/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/28/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 09/28/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/20/1993