Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 07/27/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 08/03/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 08/03/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 08/03/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 08/03/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/09/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/09/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/15/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 09/28/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/30/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/30/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/07/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/07/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 10/07/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 10/14/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/14/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 10/20/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 10/20/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/27/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/27/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/27/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/03/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/03/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/03/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/09/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 11/19/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/19/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/19/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/19/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 01/25/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 01/25/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 01/25/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/08/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 02/08/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 02/08/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 02/08/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/08/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/08/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/08/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 02/08/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/08/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/08/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 02/10/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/07/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/07/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 03/07/1994
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/07/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/08/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/09/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/09/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/11/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/11/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 03/11/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/16/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/16/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/16/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 04/19/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/19/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/19/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/19/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/19/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/19/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/19/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 06/10/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/13/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/13/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/22/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 06/22/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 07/26/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/07/1994