Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/14/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/14/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/14/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/27/1993
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 07/27/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/27/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/27/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 07/27/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/27/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/27/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/27/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/06/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 08/06/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 08/06/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 08/06/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/06/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 09/14/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/14/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/14/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/14/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/23/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/23/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/30/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 09/30/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/19/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/19/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 11/08/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 11/08/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/08/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 11/08/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/08/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/25/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/23/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/23/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 02/23/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/17/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/17/1994
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/17/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/17/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/17/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 05/12/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/12/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/12/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 05/12/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 08/09/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 08/09/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 08/09/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/09/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/09/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/26/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 09/26/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew