Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/15/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/20/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 07/21/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 07/21/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/27/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/08/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/08/1994