Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/15/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/29/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/29/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/29/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/29/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/29/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 07/29/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/29/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 07/29/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/29/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 08/06/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 08/06/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 08/06/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/06/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 08/06/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/06/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 08/06/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/06/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/28/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 09/28/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/28/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/28/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/28/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/28/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 09/28/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 09/28/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/28/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/28/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/28/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/28/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/18/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 10/18/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/18/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/18/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 10/18/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/18/1993
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 11/08/1993
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 11/08/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 11/08/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/08/1993
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/08/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/08/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/08/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 11/09/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/09/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 11/22/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/22/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/22/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/09/1994