Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 08/04/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 08/04/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/04/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/04/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/27/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/27/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/27/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/27/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/27/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 09/27/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 09/27/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/27/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 09/30/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/30/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/30/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 09/30/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 10/07/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/22/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/22/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/09/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/09/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/15/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 11/15/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/15/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/15/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/25/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 01/25/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/10/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/10/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/13/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/13/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/28/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/24/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/18/1994