There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Landmine Moratorium Extension Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend for 3 years the moratorium on the sale, export, or other transfer abroad of anti-personnel landmines, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/22/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
08/03/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations and Human Rights.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/22/1993Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/22/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/22/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 07/29/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/29/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/29/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/29/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 09/08/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/27/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/27/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 09/27/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/27/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/27/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/27/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 09/27/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 09/30/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/30/1993
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 10/26/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/26/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/26/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/26/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/26/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/26/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 10/26/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/26/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/08/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 11/08/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/08/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/22/1993 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations, and Human Rights08/03/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2706.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2706. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/22/1993)

Landmine Moratorium Extension Act of 1993 - Declares that it is U.S. policy to seek international agreements prohibiting the sale, transfer, or export, and terminating the manufacture, possession, and use, of antipersonnel landmines.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that: (1) the President should submit the 1980 Convention on Prohibitions or Restrictions on the Use of Certain Conventional Weapons Which May Be Deemed To Be Excessively Injurious or To Have Indiscriminate Effects to the Senate for ratification; and (2) the United States should negotiate a modification of the Landmine Protocol under United Nations auspices or another international agreement to limit the sale, transfer, manufacture, and use of landmines.

Prohibits for three years after this Act's enactment: (1) sales, financing, transfers, and the issuance of licenses under the Arms Export Control Act with respect to antipersonnel landmines; and (2) assistance under the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 with respect to the provision of such landmines.