Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/23/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/08/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 09/21/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/21/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/07/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/07/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 02/07/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/07/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/23/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/23/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/23/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/28/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/28/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/02/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/15/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/15/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/15/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 03/15/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/16/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/16/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/16/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/16/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/12/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 04/13/1994