Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 07/23/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 08/03/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/03/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/03/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 08/06/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 08/06/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/09/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 09/09/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/09/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/09/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/09/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/09/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/21/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/21/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/21/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 09/21/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/21/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/13/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/13/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/13/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/13/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/13/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/13/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/15/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/19/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/26/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 01/26/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 01/26/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 01/26/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/09/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/14/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 04/14/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/14/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/16/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/27/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/30/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 10/07/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/07/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/07/1994