Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/29/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/29/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/29/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 08/02/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/02/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 08/02/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 08/05/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/30/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 10/19/1993
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 10/19/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/19/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/19/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/21/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/08/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/21/1993