Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/02/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 08/02/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 08/03/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/03/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 08/03/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 08/06/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/21/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/21/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/21/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/29/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 11/17/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/17/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 11/17/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/17/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/17/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 11/22/1993