Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 07/28/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/28/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 07/28/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 07/28/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/09/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/09/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/09/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 09/09/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/09/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/09/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 09/09/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 09/09/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 10/19/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/19/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/19/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/19/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 02/02/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/23/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/09/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/29/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/26/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/09/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 09/26/1994