Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 10/28/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/28/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/28/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/28/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/28/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 11/08/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 11/08/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/08/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 11/08/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/08/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/15/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 11/15/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 11/15/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 11/18/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/25/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 02/10/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/10/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/10/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/10/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 02/10/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/10/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/10/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/21/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/21/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/21/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/21/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/21/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/21/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 04/21/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/21/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/21/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/21/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 04/21/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/21/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/21/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/21/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/25/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/25/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 08/10/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 08/10/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 08/10/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 08/10/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/29/1994