Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 08/02/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/28/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/28/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/28/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 10/28/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/28/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 10/28/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 10/28/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/28/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/28/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/28/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 10/28/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 10/28/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 10/28/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/28/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/28/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/28/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/28/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/28/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/28/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/28/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/28/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/28/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 10/28/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 10/28/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/28/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 10/28/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/28/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/28/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/28/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/04/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/04/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 11/04/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/04/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/04/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 11/04/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/04/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/04/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 11/04/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/04/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/04/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/04/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/04/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/04/1993
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 11/04/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/04/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/04/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 11/04/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/04/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/22/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/22/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 11/22/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 11/22/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 11/22/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/22/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 11/22/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/22/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/22/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 11/22/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 11/22/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 11/22/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/22/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/22/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/22/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/22/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/22/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/22/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/22/1993
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/22/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 11/22/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 11/22/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/22/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 11/22/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 11/22/1993
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/22/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 11/22/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 11/22/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 11/23/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/23/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/01/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/01/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/01/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/01/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/01/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 02/01/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/01/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 02/01/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/01/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/01/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 03/02/1994
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/02/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/02/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/02/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/02/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/02/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/02/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 03/02/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/02/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 03/02/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/02/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/02/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/02/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/02/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/02/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/02/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/02/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/02/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/02/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/02/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/02/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/02/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/02/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/24/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/24/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/24/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 03/24/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/24/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/24/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/24/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/19/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/19/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/19/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/12/1994
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 05/26/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/26/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/26/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 06/10/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/10/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/10/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/10/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/10/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/10/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/17/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/17/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/29/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/29/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 06/29/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/29/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 07/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/19/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/19/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/19/1994
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/19/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 08/01/1994