Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 08/02/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/03/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/03/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/03/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 02/03/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 02/03/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 03/01/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/01/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/01/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/01/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/01/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/01/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/01/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/01/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/01/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/01/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 03/24/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/24/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/24/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/24/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/24/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/24/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/24/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/24/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/24/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 03/24/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/08/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/08/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 06/08/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/08/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/08/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/08/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/08/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/08/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/08/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/08/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/08/1994