Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/13/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/22/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/22/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/22/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/22/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/22/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/22/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 09/22/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/22/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 09/22/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/22/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/22/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/22/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/22/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/22/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/22/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/28/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 09/28/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/28/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/28/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/28/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 09/28/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/28/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/05/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/05/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/13/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/14/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/14/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 10/19/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/22/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 11/15/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/08/1994