Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 08/06/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 08/06/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 08/06/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 08/06/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 08/06/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 08/06/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 08/06/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 08/06/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 08/06/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 08/06/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 08/06/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 08/06/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 08/06/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 08/06/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 08/06/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/06/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/06/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 08/06/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 08/06/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 08/06/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 08/06/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 08/06/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 08/06/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/06/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 08/06/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 08/06/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 08/06/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 08/06/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/08/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 09/08/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 09/08/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/04/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 10/04/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 10/04/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/04/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/04/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/04/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/04/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/04/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 10/04/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/04/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 11/16/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 11/16/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 11/16/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 01/25/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 01/25/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/25/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/11/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/11/1994
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 02/11/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/11/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/11/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/11/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/01/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/01/1994
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 03/01/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/01/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/17/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/17/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/17/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/17/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/11/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/11/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/22/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 07/22/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew