Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 08/04/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 08/04/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/30/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 09/30/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 09/30/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/30/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 09/30/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/30/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 10/14/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 10/14/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 10/14/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/14/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 10/14/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 10/14/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/14/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 10/20/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 10/20/1993
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/20/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/20/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/20/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/20/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/20/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 10/20/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/20/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/26/1994
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 01/26/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/26/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/11/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/11/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/02/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/02/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/02/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 03/02/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/08/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/17/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/17/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/17/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/24/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/24/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/04/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/04/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/04/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 05/12/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/18/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/18/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/25/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/25/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/25/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/08/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/08/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/10/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 06/21/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/12/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/14/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/14/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/20/1994
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/20/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/20/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/20/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 07/20/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/04/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew