Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 08/04/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 08/06/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 08/06/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 08/06/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 09/09/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/09/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/09/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/15/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/15/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/15/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/15/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/15/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 09/15/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/28/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/28/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/28/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/28/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/28/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/28/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/30/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 09/30/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/30/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/30/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/07/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 10/07/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/07/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/07/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/07/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 10/07/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/13/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/13/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/13/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/13/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 10/13/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 10/13/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/02/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 11/02/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/02/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/02/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/02/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 11/02/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 11/02/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/02/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 11/02/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 11/02/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/18/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/18/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/18/1993
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 11/18/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 11/18/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/18/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/18/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/18/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 11/18/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/18/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 11/18/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/22/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/01/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/01/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/01/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/01/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/01/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 02/01/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/01/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 02/01/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/01/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/01/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 02/01/1994
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/01/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 02/01/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 02/10/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/10/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/10/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/10/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/10/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/10/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/28/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/28/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/28/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/28/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 02/28/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/10/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/10/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/10/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/10/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 03/10/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/10/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 03/21/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/21/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/21/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 03/21/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 04/14/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/14/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/14/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/14/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/14/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/14/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 04/14/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/14/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 04/14/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/14/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/14/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/14/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/14/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 04/14/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 04/14/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/14/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/02/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/02/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/02/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/02/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/02/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/02/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/20/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/20/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/20/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/20/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 05/20/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/20/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/20/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/20/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/20/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/20/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/20/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/20/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/26/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/26/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 06/13/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/13/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/13/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/13/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/13/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/28/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/28/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/28/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 07/19/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/25/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/10/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 08/10/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 08/10/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 09/12/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/12/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 09/23/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 09/28/1994