Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 08/05/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 08/05/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 08/05/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 08/05/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/08/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/08/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/09/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 09/14/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 09/14/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/21/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/21/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/23/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/28/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/28/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 09/29/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 09/30/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/04/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/12/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/12/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 10/12/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/12/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/13/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/13/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 10/14/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/14/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/14/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/15/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 10/15/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/18/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/19/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/26/1993
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 10/28/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 11/02/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/04/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/04/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/08/1993