Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 01/21/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 01/21/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 01/21/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 01/21/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/21/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/21/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/21/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/21/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 01/21/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/17/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/17/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/17/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/17/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/17/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/17/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 02/17/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/17/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/17/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/17/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/24/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/24/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/24/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 06/24/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/24/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/24/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/24/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 06/24/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/24/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 06/24/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 06/24/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 07/30/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/30/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/30/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 08/05/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 08/05/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 08/05/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 08/05/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/05/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 08/05/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 08/05/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 08/06/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/09/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/09/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/09/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/09/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 09/21/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/21/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/21/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 09/21/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 10/28/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/28/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/28/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/28/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/28/1993
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 10/28/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/28/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/28/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 11/16/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/16/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 11/16/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 11/16/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 01/25/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/03/1994
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/03/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/03/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/03/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 03/11/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/11/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/22/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/22/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/22/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/22/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/22/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/24/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/24/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/19/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/19/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/19/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 04/19/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/19/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 05/11/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/11/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/11/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/11/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/11/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/11/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/11/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/11/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/24/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/24/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/24/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/24/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/24/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/09/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/09/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/09/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 06/24/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/24/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 06/24/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/24/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/24/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/24/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/24/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 07/13/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/13/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/13/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/13/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 08/04/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 08/04/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 08/04/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/04/1994
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 08/04/1994
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 08/04/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/04/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 08/04/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 08/04/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 08/04/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 08/10/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 08/10/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/10/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 08/12/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 08/12/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 08/18/1994