Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 03/08/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/08/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 03/08/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/08/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/08/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/08/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/12/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/17/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 08/17/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 08/17/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/04/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/04/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/04/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 10/04/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/04/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/07/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/07/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/07/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/07/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 10/07/1994