Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 08/06/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 10/13/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 10/21/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/21/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 10/21/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/21/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/21/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/21/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/21/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/21/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/21/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/21/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/21/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/21/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/16/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/22/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 11/22/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 11/22/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/22/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/26/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/26/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/08/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/08/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/22/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/21/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/21/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/21/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/21/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/10/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/10/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/10/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 06/10/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/10/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/03/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/03/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 08/03/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/28/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/28/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/28/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 09/28/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/28/1994